Answer in less than 2 minutes please. Oh yeah, pencil/paper AND calculators ARE NOT ALLOWED; only your mental cap.
Edit: Apparently, everyone is to dumb (not trying to be mean) to do this in his or her head, so I AM now letting you use paper and pencil if necessary.
i hate maths; i dont think i ll be able to resolve it even with a calculator xDDDDDD i dont wanna think anyway.
wow nice then; i hope i ll be present that day (;
Hey, I will teach you a cool 11's trick when the poll is over in a couple of days, okay? It works better with less digits, but I find it faster than doing the multiplication itself.
You mean the one where you sum the digits and put the sum in the middle?
Thus 24*11 = 2 (2+4=6) 4 = 264, 18*11 = 1 (1+8=9) 8 = 198 etc etc?
It is a useful shortcut.
That I believe is correct; why don't you vote for the poll?
Well, I think it's obvious that I know the answer and I'm not really a fan of polls where there is a factual answer because they tend to give the impression that opinion matters in such things whereas, of course, it doesn't.
when you do 11 * 530901, the last digit must be 1 and answer must be one of the options
So it must be a.
The way I calculated it in my head was that I put the number on top of itself shifted one digit and just summed the digits in each column. The reason this works is because 11 * 530901 = 10 * 530901 + 530901
It was as if the number had been chosen to make this calculation easy because all except one column contained 0.
You have to calculate the whole number because it could have been > Answer Choices given or < Answer Choices Given.